Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eberhard von Kirchberg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateEventTitle
30 May 1404AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
2 Feb 1406Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
Mar 1406Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
13 Aug 1413DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eberhard von Kirchberg:
Bishop Eberhard von Kirchberg (died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 7.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013