Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jozef (Joseph Paulinus Amandus) Van Kerckhoven, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1909Born
21 Sep 192819.6ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
30 Jul 193324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
1958²48.9AppointedSuperior General of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
1969²59.9CeasedSuperior General of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
28 Sep 197465.6DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jozef (Joseph Paulinus Amandus) Van Kerckhoven
Father Jozef (Joseph Paulinus Amandus) Van Kerckhoven M.S.C. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSint-Amands, Belgium
Death PlaceWilrijk, Belgium
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Borgerhout-Silsburg, Belgium

  • a priest for 41.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast