Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottone Visconti

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1207²BornInvorio
1262¹55.0AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Jul 126255.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Aug 129588.6DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottone Visconti:
Archbishop Ottone Visconti (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014