Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Visconti

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eusebio

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal of Nicholas V)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1290¹BornMilan
19 Jan 1329³39.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eusebio
19 Jan 1329³39.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Aug 133141.6AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
1332¹42.0Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
17 Jul 134252.5AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
5 Oct 135464.8DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Visconti:
Cardinal Giovanni Visconti (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 25.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332, and Page 372
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013