Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Antonio Virdia, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cariati

Titular Archbishop of Nacolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1820BornVerapodio
1840¹19.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
13 Nov 184222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
12 Mar 187757.1AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
18 Mar 187757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
23 Feb 190383.0ResignedBishop of Cariati, Italy
4 Mar 190383.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nacolia
13 Oct 190383.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cariati, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Virdia:
Archbishop Giuseppe Antonio Virdia O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cariati

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 182, and Page 400
  • d: CB, 7 Apr 2012
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,388
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013