Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie-Fortuné de Vintimille

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1751BornMarseille
1774¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 178837.2AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
15 Sep 178837.6ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
12 Oct 178837.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
6 Aug 182271.5DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Fortuné de Vintimille
Bishop François-Marie-Fortuné de Vintimille (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016