Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Vigo, O. de M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lima

Titular Bishop of Dariensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597²BornJerez de la Frontera
14 Mar 161619.2ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
10 Nov 166467.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
10 Nov 166467.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
30 Jul 166669.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vigo:
Father Antonio Vigo O. de M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lima

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 173
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015