Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simeone Veglini

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1659Born
3 Apr 168323.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 170243.0AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
4 Mar 172060.2AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
23 Jul 172060.6DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simeone Veglini
Bishop Simeone Veglini (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 37.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 389, and Page 391
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast