Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Vidoni

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581Born
19 Jan 162645.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Aug 162746.6Elevated to Cardinal
6 Oct 162746.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Quattro Coronati
30 Oct 163251.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Quattro Coronati

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Vidoni (VIAF: 89102266)
Girolamo Cardinal Vidoni (born 1581, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Quattro Coronati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast