Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Vidoni (Jr.)

Deceased

Priest of Cremona, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1759Born
8 Mar 181656.5Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181656.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
10 Aug 183070.9DiedPriest of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vidoni (Jr.) (VIAF: 89059173)
Pietro Cardinal Vidoni (Jr.) (born , died ) Priest of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona

  • a cardinal for 14.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast