Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro de Vico

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornSassari
17 Sep 163534.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oristano, Italy
17 Sep 163534.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
1641¹40.0SucceededBishop of Oristano, Italy
27 Aug 165756.7AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
19 Oct 167675.8DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Vico:
Archbishop Pietro de Vico (died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 81, and Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013