Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vencentius de Via

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1724¹BornChios
1750¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 175733.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tinos, Greece
19 Dec 175733.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
1758¹34.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
31 Jan 176238.0SucceededBishop of Tinos, Greece
Sep 179975.6DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vencentius de Via:
Bishop Vencentius de Via (born 1724, died Sep 1799) Bishop of Tinos

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361, and Page 408
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015