Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Via Cosentino

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1635Born
12 Oct 165924.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 167237.1AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
Dec 1679³44.1DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felice Via Cosentino
Bishop Felice Via Cosentino (born , died Dec 1679) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelico

  • a priest for 20.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 100
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast