Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Vespoli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1720Born
4 Apr 174424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
22 Nov 176242.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
22 Nov 176242.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Vespoli
Bishop Tommaso Vespoli (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast