Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Vera

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

Administrator of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1453Born
10 Jul 150046.6AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
28 Sep 150046.8Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150046.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
14 May 150551.4AppointedAdministrator of León, Spain
4 May 150753.4DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan de Vera (VIAF: 305407334)
Juan Cardinal de Vera (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcira, Spain

  • a cardinal for 6.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 17, Number 6
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast