Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Egloffstein

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateEventTitle
1380Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 1400SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
26 Mar 1401ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
12 Jul 1401Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
22 Nov 1411DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Egloffstein:
Bishop Johann von Egloffstein (died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013