Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Settimio Maria Vecchiotti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1812¹Born
23 Nov 185543.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
16 Mar 186351.2ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
27 Feb 188068.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Settimio Maria Vecchiotti (VIAF: 163340012)
Father Settimio Maria Vecchiotti (born 1812, died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Netherlands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceServigliano, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast