Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon van den Borch

Deceased

Bishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1477AppointedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
24 Aug 1477Ordained BishopBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
22 Oct 1492DiedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

MicroData Summary for Simon van den Borch
Bishop Simon van den Borch (died ) Bishop of Reval (Rewel)

  • a bishop for 15.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast