Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernhard von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1431¹Born
20 May 145221.3SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
20 Oct 145221.8ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1458²27.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany
9 Feb 146433.1DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernhard von Braunschweig-Lüneburg
Father Bernhard von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born 1431, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1452, Number 37*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast