Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Vaus

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Nov 1457AppointedBishop of Whithorn-Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Dec 1458AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Apr 1480DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Vaus:
Bishop Thomas Vaus (died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 77, and Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013