Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jacob Vadakeveetil, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Balasore, India


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jun 1968AppointedApostolic Administrator of Balasore, India
13 Jan 1990ResignedApostolic Administrator of Balasore, India
15 Mar 1994DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Balasore, India

MicroData Summary for Jacob Vadakeveetil
Father Jacob Vadakeveetil C.M. (died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Balasore

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast