Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kuno Cardinal von Urach, Can. Reg. of Arr †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Titular See: (Can. Reg. of Arrouaise)


Events

DateEventTitle
1108¹AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
16 Dec 1117Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
9 Aug 1122DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kuno von Urach
Kuno Cardinal von Urach Can. Reg. of Arr (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palestrina
Death PlacePalestrina

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1108
  • b/c2: ATh, 14 Oct 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast