Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Uguccione

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateEventTitle
1378²AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
1383²AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
28 Aug 1384AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
12 Jun 1405Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 1405AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
14 Jul 1412DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Uguccione:
Cardinal Francesco Uguccione (died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013