Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Turriozzi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1755BornToscanella, Italy
10 Mar 182367.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
10 Mar 182367.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Nov 182671.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Turriozzi:
Cardinal Fabrizio Turriozzi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

  • a cardinal for 3.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013