Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Turbessi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1912Born
29 Jul 192816.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Aug 193624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Aug 197462.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
1979²66.6DiedApostolic Administrator of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Turbessi (VIAF: 9921101)
Father Giuseppe Turbessi O.S.B. (born , died 1979) Apostolic Administrator of San Paolo fuori le Mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassoferrato

  • a priest for 42.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017