Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raban Truchseß von Wilburgstetten

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1295²Born
18 Dec 136570.9AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
20 Dec 136570.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 136570.9Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
18 Oct 138388.7DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raban Truchseß von Wilburgstetten (VIAF: 23215349)
Bishop Raban Truchseß von Wilburgstetten (born 1295, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilburgstetten
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a priest for 17.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • op/ob: CB, 10 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Jan 2017