Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Trevisan Suarez

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1687BornVenezia
28 Dec 171124.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172841.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rithymnia
24 Nov 173851.4AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
25 Jan 176981.5DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Trevisan Suarez:
Bishop Francesco Trevisan Suarez (born , died ) Bishop of Caorle

  • a priest for 57.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015