Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Anselmo Ludovico Tranfaglia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1889Born
8 Apr 191626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Dec 195263.0AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
Aug 1968³78.7ResignedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
14 Sep 197484.8DiedAbbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Ludovico Tranfaglia (VIAF: 307385776)
Abbot Anselmo Ludovico Tranfaglia O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceContrada

  • a priest for 58.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967
  • r/d: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017