Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Trąba

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1358¹Born
18 Jun 141052.4AppointedArchbishop of Halicz (Galyc), Ukraine
30 Apr 141254.3AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
2 Dec 142264.9DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Trąba
Archbishop Mikołaj Trąba (born 1358, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSandomierzu

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast