Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tortorelli, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹Born
12 Dec 165517.9ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
14 Apr 168446.2SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
13 Nov 168446.8ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
10 Jan 171577.0DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tortorelli
Bishop Antonio Tortorelli O.F.M. Obs. (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni Rotondi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 391
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast