Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Torres

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1548AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
11 Mar 1549Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
13 Aug 1553DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luis Torres
Archbishop Luis Torres (died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga, Diocese of Málaga, Spain
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 61, Number 343
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,549, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast