Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Nicolaus Torno

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1672³BornNapoli
5 Jun 169422.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Apr 169522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 Dec 174472.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
1756²83.6DiedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julius Nicolaus Torno:
Bishop Julius Nicolaus Torno (born , died 1756) Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia

  • a priest for 60.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015