Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andreas de Torres y Gómez

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1740Born
23 Sep 180564.8AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
12 Feb 180665.2DiedBishop-Elect of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andreas de Torres y Gómez
Father Andreas de Torres y Gómez (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIacen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast