Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal de Toledo Herrera, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1532BornCórdoba, Spain
156431.2ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
17 Sep 159361.0Elevated to Cardinal
11 Oct 159361.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
14 Sep 159663.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Toledo Herrera:
Cardinal Francisco de Toledo Herrera S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina

  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013