Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Töckheim

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Apr 1357AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
6 Mar 1364AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
29 Feb 1376DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann von Töckheim
Bishop Johann von Töckheim (died ) Bishop of Gurk

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 270, and Page 486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast