Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Tixanderie, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1322AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
19 Sep 1322Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
20 Jul 1324AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
1348¹DiedBishop of Rieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Tixanderie:
Bishop Jean de Tixanderie O.F.M. Bishop of Rieux

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 421, and Page 310
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013