Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jürgen (Georg) de Tisenhusan

Deceased

Bishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jul 1525AppointedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
20 May 1527AppointedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
12 Oct 1530DiedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

MicroData Summary for Jürgen (Georg) de Tisenhusan
Bishop Jürgen (Georg) de Tisenhusan (died ) Bishop of Reval (Rewel)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 264, and Page 285
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,525, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast