Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Terés

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539¹Born
4 Feb 157536.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarragona, Spain
4 Feb 157536.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
22 May 157940.3AppointedBishop of Elne, France
14 Apr 158647.2AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
17 Mar 158748.2AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
10 Jul 160364.5DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Terés (VIAF: 203095834)
Archbishop Juan Terés (born 1539, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerdú
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 86, Number 527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186, and Page 309
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Nov 2017