Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Teixeira Palha

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1728³BornBeja
22 Dec 175325.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Mar 175526.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 178253.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
16 Dec 178254.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
16 Dec 178254.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
1783¹54.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
5 Dec 178355.0SucceededBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
19 Nov 178657.9DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Teixeira Palha:
Bishop André Teixeira Palha (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 335, and Page 415
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016