Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rodrigo de Tello

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jan 1279AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
6 Oct 1288AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
16 Dec 1307DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Tello:
Archbishop Rodrigo de Tello (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 478, and Page 442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014