Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Damian Tcheng

Deceased

Prefect of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1878Born
4 Mar 191031.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 193556.5AppointedPrefect of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China
Jan 1945³66.3DiedPrefect of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Damian Tcheng
Father Damian Tcheng (born , died Jan 1945) Prefect of Zhaotong [Chaotung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYunnanfu
Death PlaceNingyuanfu

  • a priest for 34.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast