Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan z Targowiska

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
14 May 1484AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
26 May 1486AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1 Jun 1492DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan z Targowiska
Bishop Jan z Targowiska (died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018