Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Tapiz y Garcia

Deceased

Bishop of Durango

Note/Previous Titular See: (last appointment after death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1673²BornAndosilla, Spain
26 Feb 171441.2AppointedBishop of Durango, México
3 Feb 171542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
13 Apr 172249.3DiedBishop of Durango, México
16 Apr 172249.3AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Tapiz y Garcia:
Bishop Pedro de Tapiz y Garcia (died ) Bishop of Durango

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 32, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013