Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gilberto Tapia

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Guaranda, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1914Born
26 Jul 194228.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 195743.9AppointedBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
195843.9ResignedBishop-Elect of Guaranda, Ecuador
195944.9DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Guaranda, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Tapia
Father Gilberto Tapia (born , died 1959) Former Bishop-Elect of Guaranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Corazon

  • a priest for 16.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1958
  • b: CB, 7 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast