Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Tanara

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1681BornBologna, Italy
28 Oct 173453.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Sep 174361.8Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174361.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
29 Apr 175472.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Tanara:
Cardinal Alessandro Tanara (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013