Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Richard Talbot

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1262SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
20 Sep 1262ConfirmedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
28 Sep 1262DiedBishop-Elect of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Talbot:
Priest Richard Talbot (died ) Bishop-Elect of London

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013