Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Melchior (Menyhért) Takács, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Abbot of Jasov (Jászó), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1861Born
5 Oct 187918.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
2 Nov 188423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
7 Jun 192260.7AppointedAbbot of Jasov (Jászó), Slovakia
29 Nov 193372.2DiedAbbot of Jasov (Jászó), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Melchior (Menyhért) Takács
Archbishop Melchior (Menyhért) Takács O. Praem. (born , died ) Abbot of Jasov (Jászó)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSátoraljaújhely
Death PlaceBudapest

  • a priest for 49.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 30 Aug 2018
  • b: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 14, Page 582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 31 Aug 2018

Quantcast