Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zsigmond Antal Sztojka de Sala et Kricsfalva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1699Born
25 Dec 172627.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Mar 172728.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 174950.1SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
1 Dec 174950.7ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
23 Apr 175051.1Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
4 Jul 175960.3ResignedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
22 Apr 177071.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

MicroData Summary for Zsigmond Antal Sztojka de Sala et Kricsfalva
Bishop Zsigmond Antal Sztojka de Sala et Kricsfalva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSziget

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 412
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,122
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast