Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jan Szpilka, S.D.S.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Comores


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1950 BornGóra Jana, Poland
197423.6ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Savior
197827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
1 Apr 199847.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Comores
6 Jun 200656.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Comores

MicroData Summary for Jan Szpilka:
Priest Jan Szpilka S.D.S. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Comores

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Administration of Comores.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013