Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot András József Szennay, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Pannonhalma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1921BornBudapest
19 Nov 194423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Mar 197351.7AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
199169.5ResignedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
22 Aug 201291.2DiedAbbot Emeritus of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for András József Szennay:
Abbot András József Szennay O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Pannonhalma

  • a priest for 67.7 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015